AL HB400 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Conference Committee on HB400 2012RS first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Conference Committee on HB400 2012RS first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Digital Crime Act, computer crimes, cyberstalking, electronic harassment, phishing, data fraud, and computer tampering, criminal penalties, jurisdiction for prosecution, forfeiture of equipment, Secs. 13A-8-100, 13A-8-101, 13A-8-102, 13A-8-103 repealed
Title
Digital Crime Act, computer crimes, cyberstalking, electronic harassment, phishing, data fraud, and computer tampering, criminal penalties, jurisdiction for prosecution, forfeiture of equipment, Secs. 13A-8-100, 13A-8-101, 13A-8-102, 13A-8-103 repealed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-10 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - House - DeMarco motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Senate - Marsh motion to Accede (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - House - DeMarco motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - House - DeMarco motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Senate - Marsh motion to Accede (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - House - DeMarco motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-10 | Conference Committee on HB400 2012RS first Substitute Offered | |
2012-05-10 | Delivered to Governor at 12:47 p. m. on May 10, 2012. | |
2012-05-10 | Assigned Act No. 2012-432. | |
2012-05-10 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-10 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-10 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-10 | Concurred in Conference Report | |
2012-05-09 | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1267 | |
2012-05-09 | Conference Report Concurrence Requested | |
2012-05-09 | DeMarco motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1436 | |
2012-05-09 | Conference Report | |
2012-05-09 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2012-05-08 | Marsh motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 1208 P&PO appoints Ward, Blackwell and Bedford | |
2012-05-08 | Conference Committee Requested | |
2012-05-08 | DeMarco motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 1321 House appoints DeMarco, England and Poole | |
2012-05-08 | Concurrence Requested | |
2012-05-03 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1047 | |
2012-05-03 | Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1046 | |
2012-05-03 | Ward Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-03 | Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1045 | |
2012-05-03 | Judiciary Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-03 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-12 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2012-03-20 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary | |
2012-03-15 | Engrossed | |
2012-03-15 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 380 | |
2012-03-15 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 379 | |
2012-03-15 | JUDY 3rd Amendment Offered | |
2012-03-15 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 378 | |
2012-03-15 | JUDY 2nd Amendment Offered | |
2012-03-15 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 377 | |
2012-03-15 | JUDY 1st Amendment Offered | |
2012-03-15 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 376 | |
2012-03-15 | Judiciary first Substitute Offered | |
2012-03-15 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-08 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 3 amendments | |
2012-02-23 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |