AL HB40 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Delivered to Governor at 2:24 p.m. on March 15, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Delivered to Governor at 2:24 p.m. on March 15, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Gambling device, crime of possession of a gambling device, slot machine manufactured before 1960 exempt from under certain limited circumstances, Sec. 13A-12-27 am'd.
Title
Gambling device, crime of possession of a gambling device, slot machine manufactured before 1960 exempt from under certain limited circumstances, Sec. 13A-12-27 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Chip Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 560 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - SBIR: Gudger motion to Adopt Roll Call 559 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 62 (Y: 79 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 61 (Y: 27 N: 45 NV: 20 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2022-02-08 - House - HBIR: Brown (C) motion to Adopt Roll Call 60 (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - SBIR: Gudger motion to Adopt Roll Call 559 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 62 (Y: 79 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 61 (Y: 27 N: 45 NV: 20 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2022-02-08 - House - HBIR: Brown (C) motion to Adopt Roll Call 60 (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:24 p.m. on March 15, 2022. |
2022-03-15 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-189. |
2022-03-15 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-03-10 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-10 | House | Passed Second House |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 560 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Tourism as Favorable |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Tourism |
2022-02-08 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 62 |
2022-02-08 | House | Motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 61 |
2022-02-08 | House | Ingram Amendment Offered |
2022-02-08 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-01-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism |