AL HB40 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Assigned Act No. 2018-176.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Gas, natural gas, conversion of motor vehicles for operating on compressed natural or liquefied gas, extended weight allowances, Sec. 32-9-20 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gas, natural gas, conversion of motor vehicles for operating on compressed natural or liquefied gas, extended weight allowances, Sec. 32-9-20 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-01HouseAssigned Act No. 2018-176.
2018-03-01HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:43 a.m. on March 1, 2018.
2018-03-01HouseClerk of the House Certification
2018-03-01SenateSignature Requested
2018-02-27HouseEnrolled
2018-02-27HousePassed Second House
2018-02-27SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 526
2018-02-27SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-02-15SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-02-08SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy
2018-02-08HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 236
2018-02-08HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-01-18HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-09HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback