AL HB40 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-21 - Delivered to Governor at 2:15 p.m. on April 21, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-21 - Delivered to Governor at 2:15 p.m. on April 21, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Athlete Agents Commission, Sunset Law review, continued with modifications, applicants for registration required to be United States citizens or legally present in the United States, Sec. 8-26A-5 am'd. (2011-20320)
Title
Athlete Agents Commission, Sunset Law review, continued with modifications, applicants for registration required to be United States citizens or legally present in the United States, Sec. 8-26A-5 am'd. (2011-20320)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-21 - House - Sanderford motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-21 | Delivered to Governor at 2:15 p.m. on April 21, 2011. | |
2011-04-21 | Assigned Act No. 2011-173. | |
2011-04-21 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2011-04-21 | Enrolled | |
2011-04-21 | Signature Requested | |
2011-04-21 | Concurred in Second House Amendment | |
2011-04-21 | Sanderford motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 377 | |
2011-04-21 | Concurrence Requested | |
2011-04-14 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 258 | |
2011-04-14 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 257 | |
2011-04-14 | Williams first Substitute Offered | |
2011-04-14 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-07 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-03-31 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Accountability | |
2011-03-29 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 101 | |
2011-03-29 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-03 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-03-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |