AL HB4 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-16 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1571
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-16 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1571
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Children, failure to report a missing child in the first degree and in the second degree, failure to report the death of a child, false reporting to law enforcement authorities, crimes of established, Caylee's Law, Sec. 13A-10-9 am'd. (2012-20240)
Title
Children, failure to report a missing child in the first degree and in the second degree, failure to report the death of a child, false reporting to law enforcement authorities, crimes of established, Caylee's Law, Sec. 13A-10-9 am'd. (2012-20240)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-05-18 - Senate - Dunn motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 56) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2012-05-18 - Senate - Dunn motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 56) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1571 | |
2012-05-16 | Dunn motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1570 | |
2012-05-16 | Dunn first Substitute Offered | |
2012-05-16 | Dunn motion to Table adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-05-16 | Judiciary Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-16 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-10 | Taylor motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-05-10 | Judiciary Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-10 | Third Reading Carried Over | |
2012-04-26 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2012-04-17 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary | |
2012-04-12 | Engrossed | |
2012-04-12 | Givan intended to vote "Yea" | |
2012-04-12 | Cosponsors Added | |
2012-04-12 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 746 | |
2012-04-12 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 745 | |
2012-04-12 | Boyd Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-12 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 744 | |
2012-04-12 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 743 | |
2012-04-12 | Judiciary Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-12 | Judiciary first Substitute Offered | |
2012-04-12 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-01 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 1 amendment | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |