AL HB399 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - Currently Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - Currently Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
District Attorneys; salary further provided for
Title
District Attorneys; salary further provided for
Sponsors
Rep. Reed Ingram [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | House | Currently Indefinitely Postponed |
2024-04-11 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-10 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-04-02 | House | Pending House Ways and Means General Fund |
2024-04-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means General Fund |