AL HB399 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 11:00 a.m. on May 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 11:00 a.m. on May 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Water works boards, serving counties other than where authorizing municipality located, add'l board members, members appointed from authorizing municipality to be appointed by mayor, Act 2015-164, 2015 Reg. Sess., am'd.
Title
Water works boards, serving counties other than where authorizing municipality located, add'l board members, members appointed from authorizing municipality to be appointed by mayor, Act 2015-164, 2015 Reg. Sess., am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-03 - House - Robinson motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 43 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 62 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2016-04-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 55 Abs: 25) [FAIL]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 62 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2016-04-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 55 Abs: 25) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11:00 a.m. on May 4, 2016. |
2016-05-04 | House | Assigned Act No. 2016-276. |
2016-05-04 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2016-05-03 | House | Enrolled |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2016-05-03 | House | Hanes and Robinson intended to vote "Yea" and Mooney intended to vote "Abstain" |
2016-05-03 | House | Robinson motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 825 |
2016-05-03 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 902 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Third Reading Placed on the Calendar |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2016-04-13 | House | Engrossed |
2016-04-13 | House | Friday intended to vote "Nay" |
2016-04-13 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 602 |
2016-04-13 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 601 |
2016-04-13 | House | Commerce and Small Business Amendment Offered |
2016-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-04-05 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2016-03-15 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business |