AL HB398 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Pending third reading on day 23 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Pending third reading on day 23 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Zoning, boards of zoning adjustment, appeals of final decision, aggrieved party can file in circuit court, notice, board required to send transcript to court; Sec. 11-52-81 am'd.
Title
Zoning, boards of zoning adjustment, appeals of final decision, aggrieved party can file in circuit court, notice, board required to send transcript to court; Sec. 11-52-81 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 23 Favorable from Judiciary |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2018-03-15 | House | Engrossed |
2018-03-15 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 875 |
2018-03-15 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 874 |
2018-03-15 | House | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-01 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2018-02-08 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |