AL HB396 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Forwarded to Secretary of State at 11:59 p.m. on May 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Baldwin Co., toll road authority, authorize by local law, bonds, const. amend.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baldwin Co., toll road authority, authorize by local law, bonds, const. amend.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 28 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 60 Abs: 15) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04HouseForwarded to Secretary of State at 11:59 p.m. on May 4, 2016.
2016-05-04HouseAssigned Act No. 2016-270.
2016-05-04HouseClerk of the House Certification
2016-05-04SenateSignature Requested
2016-05-04HouseEnrolled
2016-05-04HousePassed Second House
2016-05-04SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1005
2016-05-04SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-05-03SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-04-05SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
2016-04-05HouseEngrossed
2016-04-05HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 476
2016-04-05HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 475
2016-04-05HouseBaldwin County Legislation Amendment Offered
2016-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-03-23HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2016-03-15HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback