AL HB396 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Forwarded to Governor on May 20, 2013 at 10:25 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Forwarded to Governor on May 20, 2013 at 10:25 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Family law, collaborative law agreements authorized, process requirements, confidential communications, Uniform Collaborative Law Act
Title
Family law, collaborative law agreements authorized, process requirements, confidential communications, Uniform Collaborative Law Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | House | Forwarded to Governor on May 20, 2013 at 10:25 p.m. on May 20, 2013. |
2013-05-20 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-355. |
2013-05-20 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-05-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed Second House |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1120 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-18 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 617 |
2013-04-18 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-03-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |