AL HB394 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 9:20 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 9:20 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Trusts, Principal and Income Act, apportionment between income and remainder beneficiaries, conversions of trust to unitrust provided for, Secs. 19-3A-102, 19-3A-103, 19-3A-104, 19-3A-409 am'd.; Secs. 19-3A-105, 19-3A-106, 19-3A-608 added
Title
Trusts, Principal and Income Act, apportionment between income and remainder beneficiaries, conversions of trust to unitrust provided for, Secs. 19-3A-102, 19-3A-103, 19-3A-104, 19-3A-409 am'd.; Secs. 19-3A-105, 19-3A-106, 19-3A-608 added
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:20 p.m. on May 20, 2013. |
2013-05-20 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-336. |
2013-05-20 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed Second House |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1081 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-25 | House | Engrossed |
2013-04-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 893 |
2013-04-25 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 892 |
2013-04-25 | House | Financial Services Amendment Offered |
2013-04-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2013-03-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Financial Services |