AL HB393 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Delivered to Governor at 9:15 p.m. on May 3, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Industrial hemp, manufactured by Agriculture and Industries Department or university, Agriculture Dept. to authorize, exemption from definition of marijuana for purposes on controlled substances list, Sec. 20-2-2 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Industrial hemp, manufactured by Agriculture and Industries Department or university, Agriculture Dept. to authorize, exemption from definition of marijuana for purposes on controlled substances list, Sec. 20-2-2 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-03 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-03HouseDelivered to Governor at 9:15 p.m. on May 3, 2016.
2016-05-03HouseAssigned Act No. 2016-293.
2016-05-03HouseClerk of the House Certification
2016-05-03SenateSignature Requested
2016-05-03HouseEnrolled
2016-05-03HousePassed Second House
2016-05-03SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 922
2016-04-12HouseScott intended to vote "Yea"
2016-05-03SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-04-20SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-04-13SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services
2016-04-12HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 558
2016-04-12HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-03-23HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-03-15HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback