AL HB392 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 39-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Delivered to Governor at 11:07 a.m. on May 17, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 39-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Delivered to Governor at 11:07 a.m. on May 17, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Obligation Transparency, Joint Legislative Oversight Committee on created, membership, compensation, powers, and duties, provided
Title
Obligation Transparency, Joint Legislative Oversight Committee on created, membership, compensation, powers, and duties, provided
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1397 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Melson motion to Adopt Roll Call 1396 (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Adopt Roll Call 1395 (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - SBIR: Chambliss motion to Adopt Roll Call 1394 (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - Jones (M) motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 1161 (Y: 65 N: 15 NV: 11 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - Ledbetter motion to Previous Question Roll Call 1160 (Y: 59 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 234 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 233 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - HBIR: Jones (M) motion to Adopt Roll Call 232 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Melson motion to Adopt Roll Call 1396 (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Adopt Roll Call 1395 (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - SBIR: Chambliss motion to Adopt Roll Call 1394 (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - Jones (M) motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 1161 (Y: 65 N: 15 NV: 11 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - Ledbetter motion to Previous Question Roll Call 1160 (Y: 59 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 234 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 233 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - HBIR: Jones (M) motion to Adopt Roll Call 232 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11:07 a.m. on May 17, 2021. |
2021-05-17 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-536. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Finance and Taxation General Fund first Substitute Offered |
2021-05-17 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2021-05-06 | House | Enrolled |
2021-05-06 | House | Whitt intended to vote "Abstain" |
2021-05-06 | House | Rafferty intended to vote "Yea" |
2021-05-06 | House | Jones (M) motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1161 |
2021-05-06 | House | Ledbetter motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 1160 |
2021-05-06 | House | Jones (M) motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote |
2021-05-06 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Chambliss motion to Reconsider and Table adopted Voice Vote |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1397 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Melson motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1396 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Melson Amendment Offered |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Chambliss motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1395 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Finance and Taxation General Fund zeroeth Substitute Offered |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Livingston motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2021-03-02 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 234 |
2021-03-02 | House | Engrossed |
2021-03-02 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 233 |
2021-03-02 | House | Jones (M) Amendment Offered |
2021-03-02 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-24 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-10 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |