AL HB391 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Delivered to Governor at 2:21 p.m. on May 2, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Delivered to Governor at 2:21 p.m. on May 2, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stevenson, alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales, city council authorized to regulate
Title
Stevenson, alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales, city council authorized to regulate
Sponsors
Rep. James Hanes [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 67 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2017-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 67 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:21 p.m. on May 2, 2017. |
2017-05-02 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-250. |
2017-05-02 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-04-27 | House | Enrolled |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed Second House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 771 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2017-03-15 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 282 |
2017-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-03-14 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |