AL HB390 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 20 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-20 - Forwarded to Governor on May 20, 2013 at 6:45 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 20 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-20 - Forwarded to Governor on May 20, 2013 at 6:45 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Marshall Co., local laws providing action by House and Senate delegation, construed to mean districts representing great numbers of residents of Marshall Co.
Title
Marshall Co., local laws providing action by House and Senate delegation, construed to mean districts representing great numbers of residents of Marshall Co.
Sponsors
Rep. Kerry Rich [R] | Rep. Wes Long [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | House | Forwarded to Governor on May 20, 2013 at 6:45 p.m. on May 20, 2013. |
2013-05-20 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-05-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed Second House |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1056 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |
2013-04-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 471 |
2013-04-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-03-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |