AL HB39 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - State Government first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Driver's licenses and similar cards, applicant for new or renewal, inclusion of emergency contact information in records of Alabama State Law Enforcement Agency

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Driver's licenses and similar cards, applicant for new or renewal, inclusion of emergency contact information in records of Alabama State Law Enforcement Agency

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 63 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-13HouseState Government first Amendment Offered
2018-03-13HouseDelivered to Governor at 3:22 p.m. on March 13, 2018.
2018-03-13HouseAssigned Act No. 2018-271.
2018-03-13HouseClerk of the House Certification
2018-03-13SenateSignature Requested
2018-03-08HouseEnrolled
2018-03-08HousePassed Second House
2018-03-08SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 750
2018-03-08SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-02-13SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-02-08SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
2018-02-06HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 196
2018-02-06HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-01-25HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-09HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback