AL HB39 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
County jails, prisoners, commitments, sheriff report to clerk and presiding judge with certain time frame, include date and time of commitment, Sec. 14-6-15 am'd.
Title
County jails, prisoners, commitments, sheriff report to clerk and presiding judge with certain time frame, include date and time of commitment, Sec. 14-6-15 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - Senate - Allen motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Allen motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Allen motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | House | Indefinitely Postponed |
2017-03-15 | House | Judiciary first Amendment Offered |
2017-03-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2017-02-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |