AL HB39 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Delivered to Governor on April 21, 2015 at 3:10 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Delivered to Governor on April 21, 2015 at 3:10 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State agencies, local boards of ed., colleges, employee benefits, employees to receive annual summary
Title
State agencies, local boards of ed., colleges, employee benefits, employees to receive annual summary
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-16 - Senate - Williams motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - Chesteen motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Marsh motion to Accede (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - Chesteen motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 79 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - Chesteen motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Marsh motion to Accede (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - Chesteen motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 79 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | House | Delivered to Governor on April 21, 2015 at 3:10 p.m. |
2015-04-21 | House | Assigned Act No. 2015-82. |
2015-04-21 | House | Conference Committee on HB39 2015RS first Substitute |
2015-04-21 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2015-04-21 | House | Enrolled |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2015-04-21 | House | Concurred in Conference Report |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Williams motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 567 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Conference Report Concurrence Requested |
2015-04-16 | House | Chesteen motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 420 |
2015-04-16 | House | Conference Report |
2015-04-14 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Marsh motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 440 P&PO appoints Melson, Singleton and Williams, Phil |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Conference Committee Requested |
2015-04-09 | House | Chesteen motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 332 House appoints Chesteen, Lee and Scott |
2015-04-09 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 418 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 417 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 416 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2015-03-11 | House | Engrossed |
2015-03-11 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 48 |
2015-03-11 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 47 |
2015-03-11 | House | State Government Amendment Offered |
2015-03-11 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 46 |
2015-03-11 | House | State Government first Substitute Offered |
2015-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-03-05 | House | Read a second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and with 1 amendment |
2015-03-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |