AL HB39 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Conference Committee on HB39 2012RS first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Conference Committee on HB39 2012RS first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Aircraft, certain, any parts, components, and systems used in the conversion, reconfiguration, or maintenance of, exempt from sales tax, not applicable to local sales tax unless approved, Sec. 40-23-4 am'd.
Title
Aircraft, certain, any parts, components, and systems used in the conversion, reconfiguration, or maintenance of, exempt from sales tax, not applicable to local sales tax unless approved, Sec. 40-23-4 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-05 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Miscellaneous (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - Senate - Petition to cease debate (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - Senate - Marsh motion to Accede (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - House - Lee motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - House - Lee motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2012-03-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-25 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-25 - Senate - Brooks motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 56) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 80 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 82 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Miscellaneous (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - Senate - Petition to cease debate (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - Senate - Marsh motion to Accede (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - House - Lee motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - House - Lee motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2012-03-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-25 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-25 - Senate - Brooks motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 56) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 80 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 82 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | Conference Committee on HB39 2012RS first Substitute Offered | |
2012-04-05 | Delivered to Governor at 5:45 p. m. on April 5, 2012. | |
2012-04-05 | Assigned Act No. 2012-185. | |
2012-04-05 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-04-05 | Signature Requested | |
2012-04-05 | Enrolled | |
2012-04-05 | Concurred in Conference Report | |
2012-04-05 | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 461 | |
2012-04-05 | Petition to cease debate adopted Roll Call 460. | |
2012-04-05 | Petition to cease debate lost Roll Call 458. | |
2012-04-05 | Conference Report Concurrence Requested | |
2012-04-03 | Lee motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 566 | |
2012-04-03 | Conference Report | |
2012-04-03 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2012-04-03 | Marsh motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 433 P&PO appoints Brooks, Figures and Pittman | |
2012-04-03 | Conference Committee Requested | |
2012-04-03 | Lee motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 548 House appoints Lee, Chesteen and Buskey | |
2012-04-03 | Concurrence Requested | |
2012-03-22 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 371 | |
2012-03-22 | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 370 | |
2012-03-22 | Orr Amendment Offered | |
2012-03-22 | Brooks motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 369 | |
2012-03-22 | Finance and Taxation Education Amendment Offered | |
2012-03-22 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-15 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2012-02-09 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education | |
2012-02-09 | Engrossed | |
2012-02-09 | Buttram intended to "Yea" and Boyd intended to vote "Nay" | |
2012-02-09 | Cosponsors Added | |
2012-02-09 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 8 | |
2012-02-09 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 7 | |
2012-02-09 | Economic Development and Tourism Amendment Offered | |
2012-02-09 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-08 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism |