AL HB389 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5)
Status: Passed on June 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - Forwarded to Governor at 8:40 p.m. on June 9, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Radio/alert notification communications districts, counties authorized to establish, board of directors, members, powers, duties, opt out provision (2011-21180)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Radio/alert notification communications districts, counties authorized to establish, board of directors, members, powers, duties, opt out provision (2011-21180)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-09 - Senate - Fielding motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - House - Boyd motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Marsh motion to Accede (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - Boyd motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-09 Forwarded to Governor at 8:40 p.m. on June 9, 2011.
2011-06-09 Conference Committee on HB389 2011RS first Substitute Offered
2011-06-09 Assigned Act No. 2011-675.
2011-06-09 Clerk of the House Certification
2011-06-09 Signature Requested
2011-06-09 Concurred in Conference Report
2011-06-09 Fielding motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1071
2011-06-09 Enrolled
2011-06-09 Conference Report Concurrence Requested
2011-06-09 Boyd motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1154
2011-06-09 Conference Report
2011-06-02 Conference Committee Appointed
2011-06-02 Marsh motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 974 Senate appts. Fielding, Marsh and Beason.
2011-06-02 Conference Committee Requested
2011-06-02 Boyd motion to Nonconcur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 1085 House appoints House appoints Boyd, Brown and Wood
2011-06-02 Concurrence Requested
2011-06-02 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 942
2011-06-02 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 941
2011-06-02 Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered
2011-06-02 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 940
2011-06-02 Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered
2011-06-02 Third Reading Passed
2011-04-26 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
2011-04-14 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
2011-04-14 Engrossed
2011-04-14 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 270
2011-04-14 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 269
2011-04-14 Wood Amendment Offered
2011-04-14 Third Reading Passed
2011-04-06 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2011-03-31 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB389
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2011RS/PrintFiles/HB389-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2011RS/PrintFiles/HB389-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2011RS/PrintFiles/HB389-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=404446&VOTE=269&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=404447&VOTE=270&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=419504&VOTE=940&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=419505&VOTE=941&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=419506&VOTE=942&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=419587&VOTE=1085&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=419876&VOTE=974&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=421790&VOTE=1154&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=422047&VOTE=1071&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback