AL HB388 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Delivered to Governor at 10:30 a.m. on May 31, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Education, K-3 grades, Alabama Literacy Act, established, steps to improve reading proficiency

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education, K-3 grades, Alabama Literacy Act, established, steps to improve reading proficiency

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - House - Collins motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Gudger motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 3 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:30 a.m. on May 31, 2019.
2019-05-31HouseAssigned Act No. 2019-523.
2019-05-31HouseClerk of the House Certification
2019-05-31HouseEnrolled
2019-05-31SenateSignature Requested
2019-05-31SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2019-05-30HouseCollins motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1238
2019-05-30HouseConcurrence Requested
2019-05-15HouseEngrossed
2019-05-30SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1378
2019-05-30SenateSmitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1377
2019-05-15HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 757
2019-05-30SenateSmitherman Amendment Offered
2019-05-15HouseCollins motion to Miscellaneous adopted Voice Vote
2019-05-15HouseGivan intended to vote "Nay"
2019-05-30SenateGudger motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1376
2019-05-30SenateGudger Amendment Offered
2019-05-15HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 756
2019-05-15HouseMoore (M) Amendment Offered
2019-05-30SenateRules Committee Petition to Cease Debate lost Roll Call 1375
2019-05-30SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-05-15HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 755
2019-05-21SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-05-15HouseThird Reading Open
2019-05-16SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy
2019-05-15HouseCollins motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2019-05-15HouseCollins first Substitute Offered
2019-05-15HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-04-25HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-04-09HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB388&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB388-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB388-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB388-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/200613-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/201439-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/202315-4.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/202322-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=619878&VOTE=755&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=619880&VOTE=756&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=619888&VOTE=757&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=626786&VOTE=1375&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=626788&VOTE=1376&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=626790&VOTE=1377&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=626791&VOTE=1378&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=626867&VOTE=1238&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback