AL HB388 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Delivered to Governor at 6:10 p.m. on March 28, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Military Family Jobs Opportunity Act, professional licensing boards required to issue licenses and certificates to military spouses who hold licenses and certificates from other states, required to issue temporary licenses and certificates in certain instances when other state has lesser requirements, Sec. 31-1-6 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Military Family Jobs Opportunity Act, professional licensing boards required to issue licenses and certificates to military spouses who hold licenses and certificates from other states, required to issue temporary licenses and certificates in certain instances when other state has lesser requirements, Sec. 31-1-6 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - House - Drake motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - McClammy motion to Table (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28HouseDelivered to Governor at 6:10 p.m. on March 28, 2018.
2018-03-28HouseAssigned Act No. 2018-540.
2018-03-28HouseClerk of the House Certification
2018-03-28SenateSignature Requested
2018-03-28HouseEnrolled
2018-03-28SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2018-03-28HouseDrake motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1085
2018-03-28HouseConcurrence Requested
2018-03-22SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1061
2018-03-22SenateDial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1060
2018-03-22SenateVeterans and Military Affairs Amendment Offered
2018-03-22SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-03-20SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2018-03-06SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Veterans and Military Affairs
2018-02-27HouseEngrossed
2018-02-27HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 506
2018-02-27HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 505
2018-02-27HouseBeech Amendment Offered
2018-02-27HouseMcClammy motion to Table adopted Roll Call 504
2018-02-27HouseMilitary and Veterans Affairs Amendment Offered
2018-02-27HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-02-15HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2018-02-08HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Military and Veterans Affairs

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB388&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/HB388-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/HB388-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/HB388-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/191588-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/192313-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/192739-2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=591113&VOTE=504&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=591115&VOTE=505&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=591116&VOTE=506&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=600090&VOTE=1060&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=600093&VOTE=1061&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=602210&VOTE=1085&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback