AL HB386 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Second degree assault, enhanced penalties for violations against law enforcement officers, firefighters and other specified persons, Sec. 13A-6-21 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Second degree assault, enhanced penalties for violations against law enforcement officers, firefighters and other specified persons, Sec. 13A-6-21 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04SenateFurther Consideration
2016-05-04SenateWard motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2016-05-04SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2016-05-03SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-04-26SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
2016-04-21HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 721
2016-04-21HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-04-07HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-03-15HouseRereferred from Judy to PS&HS
2016-03-10HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback