AL HB385 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Delivered to Governor at 5:17 p.m. on April 20, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Delivered to Governor at 5:17 p.m. on April 20, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Education, public K-12 schools, sex education, revising the focus of content, course materials and instructions provided, Sec. 16-40A-2 am'd.
Title
Education, public K-12 schools, sex education, revising the focus of content, course materials and instructions provided, Sec. 16-40A-2 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Laura Hall [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1053 (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - SBIR: Figures motion to Adopt Roll Call 1043 (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 243 (Y: 69 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 242 (Y: 70 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 241 (Y: 62 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 240 (Y: 75 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - HBIR: Hall motion to Adopt Roll Call 239 (Y: 78 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - SBIR: Figures motion to Adopt Roll Call 1043 (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 243 (Y: 69 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 242 (Y: 70 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 241 (Y: 62 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 240 (Y: 75 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - HBIR: Hall motion to Adopt Roll Call 239 (Y: 78 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 5:17 p.m. on April 20, 2021. |
2021-04-20 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-293. |
2021-04-20 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-04-20 | House | Enrolled |
2021-04-20 | House | Passed Second House |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1053 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Figures motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Figures motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2021-03-02 | House | Crawford intended to vote "Yea" |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2021-03-02 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 243 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy |
2021-03-02 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 242 |
2021-03-02 | House | Kitchens Amendment Offered |
2021-03-02 | House | Engrossed |
2021-03-02 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 241 |
2021-03-02 | House | Crawford Amendment Offered |
2021-03-02 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 240 |
2021-03-02 | House | Kiel Amendment Offered |
2021-03-02 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-24 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |