AL HB385 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Delivered to Governor at 6:26 p.m. on May 31, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Education, school safety plans, redesignate code red as school lockdown, Secs. 16-1-44, 36-19-10 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education, school safety plans, redesignate code red as school lockdown, Secs. 16-1-44, 36-19-10 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31HouseDelivered to Governor at 6:26 p.m. on May 31, 2019.
2019-05-31HouseAssigned Act No. 2019-533.
2019-05-31HouseClerk of the House Certification
2019-05-31SenateSignature Requested
2019-05-31HouseEnrolled
2019-05-31HousePassed Second House
2019-05-31SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1485
2019-05-31SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-05-31SenateWard motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2019-05-31SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2019-05-29SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-05-28SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy
2019-05-23HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1007
2019-05-23HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-04-25HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-04-09HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback