AL HB385 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Forwarded to Governor on March 28, 2018 at 4:30 p.m. on March 28, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Forwarded to Governor on March 28, 2018 at 4:30 p.m. on March 28, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Emergency medical technicians or paramedics, certification, tuition reimbursement program by community colleges, Ala. Fire College, and Univ. of South Alabama, Volunteer Rescue Squad Tuition Reimbursement Act of 2018.
Title
Emergency medical technicians or paramedics, certification, tuition reimbursement program by community colleges, Ala. Fire College, and Univ. of South Alabama, Volunteer Rescue Squad Tuition Reimbursement Act of 2018.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Lovvorn [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - House - Lovvorn motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Forwarded to Governor on March 28, 2018 at 4:30 p.m. on March 28, 2018. |
2018-03-28 | House | Ways and Means Education first Amendment Offered |
2018-03-28 | House | Assigned Act No. 2018-524. |
2018-03-28 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2018-03-28 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2018-03-28 | House | Lovvorn motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1081 |
2018-03-28 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1065 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1064 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Orr Amendment Offered |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Dial motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education Amendment Offered |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
2018-03-08 | House | Engrossed |
2018-03-08 | House | Cosponsors Added |
2018-03-08 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 671 |
2018-03-08 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 670 |
2018-03-08 | House | Whorton (R) Amendment Offered |
2018-03-08 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 669 |
2018-03-08 | House | Ways and Means Education Amendment Offered |
2018-03-08 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 668 |
2018-03-08 | House | Ways and Means Education first Substitute Offered |
2018-03-08 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-01 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 1 amendment |
2018-02-06 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |