AL HB383 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Delivered to Governor at 10:26 a.m. on May 17, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Delivered to Governor at 10:26 a.m. on May 17, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Talladega Co., pistol permit fee reduced for individuals over age 65, Act 87-416, 1987 Reg. Sess., am'd.
Title
Talladega Co., pistol permit fee reduced for individuals over age 65, Act 87-416, 1987 Reg. Sess., am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - House - Hurst motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - Ledbetter motion to Previous Question (Y: 70 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - McClendon motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 56 Abs: 34) [FAIL]
2017-05-16 - House - Ledbetter motion to Previous Question (Y: 70 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - McClendon motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 56 Abs: 34) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:26 a.m. on May 17, 2017. |
2017-05-17 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-418. |
2017-05-17 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-05-16 | House | Enrolled |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2017-05-16 | House | Hurst motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 912 |
2017-05-16 | House | Ledbetter motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 911 |
2017-05-16 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 778 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | McClendon motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 777 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | McClendon Amendment Offered |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2017-03-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 341 |
2017-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-03-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |