AL HB383 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 8:40 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 8:40 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Nursing facilities, Medicaid reimbursement, supplement assessment extended, supplemental provider privilege assessment increased, inflation factor moved to zero, Medicaid Agency authorized to create reimbursement formula for ventilator care units, Secs. 40-26B-21, 40-26B-22, 40-26B-23, 40-26B-24, 40-26B-25, 40-26B-26 am'd.; Act 2010-520, 2010 Reg. Sess. am'd.
Title
Nursing facilities, Medicaid reimbursement, supplement assessment extended, supplemental provider privilege assessment increased, inflation factor moved to zero, Medicaid Agency authorized to create reimbursement formula for ventilator care units, Secs. 40-26B-21, 40-26B-22, 40-26B-23, 40-26B-24, 40-26B-25, 40-26B-26 am'd.; Act 2010-520, 2010 Reg. Sess. am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Barton [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Delivered to Governor at 8:40 p.m. on June 2, 2011. | |
2011-06-02 | Assigned Act No. 2011-614. | |
2011-06-02 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2011-06-02 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-02 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Passed Second House | |
2011-06-02 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1031 | |
2011-06-02 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-05 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-04-27 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health | |
2011-04-26 | Engrossed | |
2011-04-26 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 475 | |
2011-04-26 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 474 | |
2011-04-26 | Barton Amendment Offered | |
2011-04-26 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-06 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-03-31 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |