AL HB382 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Athletic Trainers, Board of, treatment of physically active individual provided, relationship between trainer and supervising or referring physician provided, Jt. Committee of St. Board of Medical Examiners and Board of Athletic Trainers created, Sec. 34-40-3.2 added; Secs. 34-40-2, 34-40-3, 34-40-5, 34-40-6, 34-40-9, 34-40-10, 34-40-15, 34-40-16 am'd.
Title
Athletic Trainers, Board of, treatment of physically active individual provided, relationship between trainer and supervising or referring physician provided, Jt. Committee of St. Board of Medical Examiners and Board of Athletic Trainers created, Sec. 34-40-3.2 added; Secs. 34-40-2, 34-40-3, 34-40-5, 34-40-6, 34-40-9, 34-40-10, 34-40-15, 34-40-16 am'd.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Indefinitely Postponed |
2021-02-24 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |
Same As/Similar To
SB73 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Assigned Act No. 2021-113.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
34 | 40 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 40 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 40 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 40 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 40 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 40 | 3.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 40 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 40 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 40 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |