AL HB381 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Delivered to Governor at 3:46 p.m. on May 28, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Delivered to Governor at 3:46 p.m. on May 28, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Health care, persons physically or mentally disabled persons, consent not required under certain conditions, nurse practitioners and physician assistants included in providers authorized, procedures for determination by practitioners, Sec. 22-8-1 am'd.
Title
Health care, persons physically or mentally disabled persons, consent not required under certain conditions, nurse practitioners and physician assistants included in providers authorized, procedures for determination by practitioners, Sec. 22-8-1 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Wes Allen [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | House | Delivered to Governor at 3:46 p.m. on May 28, 2019. |
2019-05-28 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-355. |
2019-05-28 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-23 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-23 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1154 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Chesteen motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Healthcare |
2019-05-02 | House | Rafferty intended to vote "Yea" |
2019-05-02 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 475 |
2019-05-02 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-25 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |