AL HB381 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Forwarded to Governor on May 17, 2017 at 5:13 p.m. on May 17, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Forwarded to Governor on May 17, 2017 at 5:13 p.m. on May 17, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Schools, influenza vaccine, local boards of education to provide information, Education Dept. to make information available, Sec. 16-1-49 added
Title
Schools, influenza vaccine, local boards of education to provide information, Education Dept. to make information available, Sec. 16-1-49 added
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | House | Forwarded to Governor on May 17, 2017 at 5:13 p.m. on May 17, 2017. |
2017-05-17 | House | Education Policy first Amendment Offered |
2017-05-17 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-368. |
2017-05-17 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-05-17 | House | Enrolled |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-05-17 | House | Passed Second House |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1180 |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services |
2017-04-18 | House | Engrossed |
2017-04-18 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 534 |
2017-04-18 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 533 |
2017-04-18 | House | Education Policy Amendment Offered |
2017-04-18 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-06 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2017-03-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |