AL HB380 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Civil immunity, provided to response action contractors responding to hazardous materials discharged, civil immunity to responders to oil spills, includes gasoline spills, Secs. 6-5-332.1, 6-5-332.2 am'd.
Title
Civil immunity, provided to response action contractors responding to hazardous materials discharged, civil immunity to responders to oil spills, includes gasoline spills, Secs. 6-5-332.1, 6-5-332.2 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | Senate | |
2015-06-04 | House | Delivered to Governor at 6:55 p.m. on June 4, 2015. |
2015-06-04 | House | Assigned Act No. 2015-466. |
2015-06-04 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2015-06-04 | House | Enrolled |
2015-06-04 | House | Passed Second House |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1509 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Whatley motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2015-05-19 | House | Engrossed |
2015-05-19 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 915 |
2015-05-19 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 914 |
2015-05-19 | House | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2015-05-19 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-07 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2015-03-31 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |