AL HB38 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 46-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-15 - Pending third reading on day 14 Favorable from Veterans and Military Affairs with 1 amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-15 - Pending third reading on day 14 Favorable from Veterans and Military Affairs with 1 amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Immigration, legal status and/or proof of citizenship, verification of eligibility to enter into business transactions with state or political subdivision, Uniformed Services Privilege and Identification card authorized, Act 2011-535, 2011 Reg. Sess. am'd.; Sec. 31-13-29 am'd.
Title
Immigration, legal status and/or proof of citizenship, verification of eligibility to enter into business transactions with state or political subdivision, Uniformed Services Privilege and Identification card authorized, Act 2011-535, 2011 Reg. Sess. am'd.; Sec. 31-13-29 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Baker [R] | Rep. Mike Ball [R] | Rep. Richard Baughn [R] | Rep. Alan Boothe [R] |
Rep. Harry Bridges [R] | Rep. K.L. Brown [R] | Rep. Jim Carns [R] | Sen. Donnie Chesteen [R] |
Rep. Steve Clouse [R] | Rep. Terri Collins [R] | Rep. Allen Farley [R] | Rep. Chad Fincher [R] |
Rep. Blaine Galliher [R] | Rep. Victor Gaston [R] | Rep. Lynn Greer [R] | Rep. Micky Hammon [R] |
Rep. Ed Henry [R] | Rep. Mike Hubbard [R] | Rep. James Ison [R] | Rep. Ken Johnson [R] |
Rep. Wayne Johnson [R] | Rep. Mike Jones [R] | Rep. Paul Lee [R] | Rep. Wes Long [R] |
Rep. Jay Love [R] | Rep. Mary McClurkin [R] | Rep. Mac McCutcheon [R] | Rep. Steve McMillan [R] |
Rep. John Merrill [R] | Rep. Mike Millican [R] | Rep. Barry Moore [R] | Rep. Becky Nordgren [R] |
Rep. Jim Patterson [R] | Rep. William Poole [R] | Rep. William Roberts [R] | Rep. Howard Sanderford [R] |
Rep. Harry Shiver [R] | Rep. Allen Treadaway [R] | Rep. Mark Tuggle [R] | Rep. Lesley Vance [R] |
Sen. April Weaver [R] | Rep. Dan Williams [R] | Rep. Jack Williams [R] | Rep. Phil Williams [R] |
Rep. Randy Wood [R] | Rep. Gregory Wren [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 80 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 80 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-15 | Pending third reading on day 14 Favorable from Veterans and Military Affairs with 1 amendment | |
2012-03-15 | Veterans and Military Affairs first Amendment Offered | |
2012-03-15 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2012-02-28 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Veterans and Military Affairs | |
2012-02-23 | Engrossed | |
2012-02-23 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 96 | |
2012-02-23 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 95 | |
2012-02-23 | PS&HS Amendment Offered | |
2012-02-23 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-08 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |