AL HB379 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Judiciary first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Indigent defense, juvenile court, guardian ad litems, maximum atty fee for services raised, Sec. 15-12-21 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Indigent defense, juvenile court, guardian ad litems, maximum atty fee for services raised, Sec. 15-12-21 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22HouseJudiciary first Amendment Offered
2018-03-22SenateFinance and Taxation General Fund first Amendment Offered
2018-03-22SenatePending third reading on day 24 Favorable from Finance and Taxation General Fund with 1 amendment
2018-03-22SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2018-03-15HouseWhorton (I) filed conflict of interest
2018-03-20SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
2018-03-15HouseEngrossed
2018-03-15HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 827
2018-03-15HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 826
2018-03-15HouseJones Amendment Offered
2018-03-15HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 825
2018-03-15HouseJudiciary Amendment Offered
2018-03-15HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 824
2018-03-15HouseJudiciary first Substitute Offered
2018-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-03-08HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 1 amendment
2018-02-06HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB379&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/HB379-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/HB379-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/192857-3.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/192374-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/193399-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=597122&VOTE=824&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=597130&VOTE=825&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=597147&VOTE=826&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=597148&VOTE=827&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback