AL HB379 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 29-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Capital punishment, person or entity who participates in an execution or performs any ancillary function shall be confidential, Sec. 15-18-82.1 am'd.
Title
Capital punishment, person or entity who participates in an execution or performs any ancillary function shall be confidential, Sec. 15-18-82.1 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-03 - Senate - Ward motion to Table (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - Senate - Ward motion to Table (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 77 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 81 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - Senate - Ward motion to Table (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 77 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 81 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Senate | Further Consideration |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Marsh motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1249 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Ward Amendment Offered |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Ward motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Ward Amendment Offered |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Ward motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1243 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1242 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Health Amendment Offered |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Health Amendment Offered |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Marsh motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health |
2014-03-06 | House | Engrossed |
2014-03-06 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 646 |
2014-03-06 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 645 |
2014-03-06 | House | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2014-03-06 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-18 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2014-01-30 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |