AL HB378 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Finance and Taxation General Fund
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Finance and Taxation General Fund
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Disabled persons, preference for services provided by under direction of the Department of Alabama Institute for Deaf and Blind, Sec. 21-2-2 am'd.
Title
Disabled persons, preference for services provided by under direction of the Department of Alabama Institute for Deaf and Blind, Sec. 21-2-2 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2014-03-20 | House | Engrossed |
2014-03-20 | House | Cosponsors Added |
2014-03-20 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 950 |
2014-03-20 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 949 |
2014-03-20 | House | State Government Amendment Offered |
2014-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-06 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2014-01-30 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |