AL HB372 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Virtual currency, exemption from ad valorem taxation provided, Sec. 40-9-1 am'd.
Title
Virtual currency, exemption from ad valorem taxation provided, Sec. 40-9-1 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - House - HBIR: Warren motion to Adopt Roll Call 403 (Y: 37 N: 44 NV: 10 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2021-03-11 - House - HBIR: Warren motion to Reconsider Roll Call 402 (Y: 60 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - HBIR: Sorrell motion to Adopt Roll Call 401 (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 25 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2021-03-11 - House - HBIR: Warren motion to Reconsider Roll Call 402 (Y: 60 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - HBIR: Sorrell motion to Adopt Roll Call 401 (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 25 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Indefinitely Postponed |
2021-02-24 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |