AL HB372 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-20 - Ways and Means General Fund first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-20 - Ways and Means General Fund first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Medicaid, Legislative committees on, Permanent Joint Medicaid Committee estab., Joint Legislative Interim Committee and Permanent Joint Legislative Committee on Medicaid Policy abolished, duties, members, expenses, Medicaid Advisory Commission estab. composed of health care providers
Title
Medicaid, Legislative committees on, Permanent Joint Medicaid Committee estab., Joint Legislative Interim Committee and Permanent Joint Legislative Committee on Medicaid Policy abolished, duties, members, expenses, Medicaid Advisory Commission estab. composed of health care providers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | Senate | Ways and Means General Fund first Amendment Offered |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Died in Senate Basket. |
2013-04-23 | House | Engrossed |
2013-04-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 735 |
2013-04-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 734 |
2013-04-23 | House | Wren Amendment Offered |
2013-04-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 733 |
2013-04-23 | House | Ways and Means General Fund Amendment Offered |
2013-04-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 732 |
2013-04-23 | House | Ways and Means General Fund first Substitute Offered |
2013-04-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 1 amendment |
2013-02-28 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |