AL HB37 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 11:42 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Alabama Purchase of Local Agricultural Products Incentive Program and Fund, established, restaurants purchasing certain agricultural products, rebates authorized, Agriculture and Industries Department to administer, appropriation, termination date specified

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alabama Purchase of Local Agricultural Products Incentive Program and Fund, established, restaurants purchasing certain agricultural products, rebates authorized, Agriculture and Industries Department to administer, appropriation, termination date specified

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-17 - House - Hubbard (J) motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Holley motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-16 Delivered to Governor at 11:42 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
2012-05-16 Clerk of the House Certification
2012-05-16 Signature Requested
2012-05-16 Enrolled
2012-05-16 Concurred in Second House Amendment
2012-05-16 Hubbard (J) motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1597
2012-05-16 Concurrence Requested
2012-05-16 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1464
2012-05-16 Holley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1463
2012-05-16 Finance and Taxation Education Amendment Offered
2012-05-16 Third Reading Passed
2012-05-08 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2012-05-03 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
2012-05-03 Engrossed
2012-05-03 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1211
2012-05-03 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1210
2012-05-03 Agriculture and Forestry Amendment Offered
2012-05-03 Third Reading Passed
2012-04-10 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2012-02-07 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB37
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB37-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB37-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB37-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=444365&VOTE=1210&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=444380&VOTE=1211&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=450362&VOTE=1463&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=450363&VOTE=1464&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=450797&VOTE=1597&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback