AL HB369 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Forwarded to Governor on May 7, 2019 at 3:54 p.m. on May 7, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Class 2 municipalities, State Pilotage Commission estab., Chapter 4, Title 33, Code of Alabama 1975 repealed and replaced, Sec. 33-4-1 to 33-4-57, inclusive, repealed

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Class 2 municipalities, State Pilotage Commission estab., Chapter 4, Title 33, Code of Alabama 1975 repealed and replaced, Sec. 33-4-1 to 33-4-57, inclusive, repealed

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - House - Pringle motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Sessions motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 68 Abs: 11) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07HouseForwarded to Governor on May 7, 2019 at 3:54 p.m. on May 7, 2019.
2019-05-07HouseAssigned Act No. 2019-162.
2019-05-07HouseClerk of the House Certification
2019-05-07HouseEnrolled
2019-05-07SenateSignature Requested
2019-05-07SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2019-05-07HousePringle motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 538
2019-05-07HouseConcurrence Requested
2019-05-02SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 532
2019-05-02SenateSessions motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 531
2019-05-02SenateMobile County Legislation first Substitute Offered
2019-05-02SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-04-30SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2019-04-18SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Mobile County Legislation
2019-04-18HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 238
2019-04-18HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-04-11HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-04-09HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Mobile County Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB369&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB369-int.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/199847-2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=611229&VOTE=238&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=615222&VOTE=531&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=615223&VOTE=532&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=616077&VOTE=538&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback