AL HB369 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Delivered to Governor at 4:05 p.m. on April 14, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Delivered to Governor at 4:05 p.m. on April 14, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commercial fishing vessels, purchase of certain equipment, exemption from sales and use taxation, form
Title
Commercial fishing vessels, purchase of certain equipment, exemption from sales and use taxation, form
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-14 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Delivered to Governor at 4:05 p.m. on April 14, 2010. | |
2010-04-14 | Assigned Act No. 2010-511. | |
2010-04-14 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2010-04-14 | Signature Requested | |
2010-04-14 | Enrolled | |
2010-04-14 | Passed Second House | |
2010-04-14 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1076 | |
2010-04-14 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-01 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-03-23 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund | |
2010-03-11 | Engrossed | |
2010-03-11 | Gordon intended to vote Yea | |
2010-03-11 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 568 | |
2010-03-11 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 567 | |
2010-03-11 | Government Operations first Substitute Offered | |
2010-03-11 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-11 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2010-01-21 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Government Operations |