AL HB368 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Cullman Co., cemetery board established, terms defined, members and duties, provided for, funding provided

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cullman Co., cemetery board established, terms defined, members and duties, provided for, funding provided

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 70 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2016-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 70 Abs: 18) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04HouseDelivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 4, 2016.
2016-05-04HouseAssigned Act No. 2016-366.
2016-05-04HouseClerk of the House Certification
2016-05-04SenateSignature Requested
2016-05-04HouseEnrolled
2016-05-04HousePassed Second House
2016-05-04SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 999
2016-05-04SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-04-20SenateBussman motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2016-04-20SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2016-04-19SenateSingleton motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
2016-04-19SenateThird Reading Carried Over
2016-04-07SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-03-15SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
2016-03-15HouseEngrossed
2016-03-15HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 293
2016-03-15HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 292
2016-03-15HouseLocal Legislation first Substitute Offered
2016-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-03-10HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2016-03-03HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback