AL HB368 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - Pending third reading on day 17 Favorable from Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - Pending third reading on day 17 Favorable from Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Law enforcement officers, authorized to issue traffic citations at the scene of the crash for traffic offenses, under certain conditions, additional fines, Sec. 32-5-171 am'd.
Title
Law enforcement officers, authorized to issue traffic citations at the scene of the crash for traffic offenses, under certain conditions, additional fines, Sec. 32-5-171 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Ball [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-20 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 17 Favorable from Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities |
2014-02-13 | House | Engrossed |
2014-02-13 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 301 |
2014-02-13 | House | Mitchell intended to vote "Yea" |
2014-02-13 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 300 |
2014-02-13 | House | Bracy Amendment Offered |
2014-02-13 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 299 |
2014-02-13 | House | Public Safety and Homeland Security Amendment Offered |
2014-02-13 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-06 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2014-01-30 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |