AL HB367 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-09 - Delivered to Governor at 3:33 p.m. on May 9, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-09 - Delivered to Governor at 3:33 p.m. on May 9, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
St. Clair Co., probate office, filing and recording fee provided, County Mental Health Advisory Board, provided
Title
St. Clair Co., probate office, filing and recording fee provided, County Mental Health Advisory Board, provided
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 31 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 31 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 31 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 31 Abs: 35) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-09 | House | Delivered to Governor at 3:33 p.m. on May 9, 2020. |
2020-05-09 | House | Assigned Act No. 2020-190. |
2020-05-09 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2020-05-09 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2020-05-09 | House | Enrolled |
2020-05-09 | House | Passed Second House |
2020-05-09 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 671 |
2020-05-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2020-05-08 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2020-05-06 | House | Engrossed |
2020-05-06 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 427 |
2020-05-06 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 426 |
2020-05-06 | House | Local Legislation Amendment Offered |
2020-05-06 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2020-05-05 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2020-03-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |