AL HB367 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Assigned Act No. 2015-264.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Assigned Act No. 2015-264.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Montgomery Co., service of process fees for civil or criminal documents increased, distrib., exceptions
Title
Montgomery Co., service of process fees for civil or criminal documents increased, distrib., exceptions
Sponsors
Rep. Reed Ingram [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 74 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2015-05-12 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 65 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2015-05-12 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 74 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2015-05-12 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 65 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | House | Assigned Act No. 2015-264. |
2015-05-21 | House | Delivered to Governor at 3:15 p.m. on May 21, 2015. |
2015-05-21 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2015-05-21 | House | Enrolled |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2015-05-21 | House | Passed Second House |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1091 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2015-05-12 | House | Engrossed |
2015-05-12 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 649 |
2015-05-12 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 648 |
2015-05-12 | House | Montgomery County Legislation Amendment Offered |
2015-05-12 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-05 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2015-03-31 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Montgomery County Legislation |