AL HB367 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Assigned Act No. 2014-351.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Assigned Act No. 2014-351.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State employees, bonus, for fiscal year beginning October 1, 2014, conditional cost-of-living increase
Title
State employees, bonus, for fiscal year beginning October 1, 2014, conditional cost-of-living increase
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-03 - House - Clouse motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - Senate - Orr motion to Table (Y: 15 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - Clouse motion to Table (Y: 64 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - Senate - Orr motion to Table (Y: 15 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - Clouse motion to Table (Y: 64 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-351. |
2014-04-03 | House | Forwarded to Governor on April 3, 2014 at 8:20 p.m. on April 3, 2014. |
2014-04-03 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-04-03 | House | Enrolled |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2014-04-03 | House | Grimsley intended to Abstain due to conflict of interest and Robinson (O) intended to vote "Nay" |
2014-04-03 | House | Grimsley Conflict of interest Declartion Filed |
2014-04-03 | House | Clouse motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1140 |
2014-04-03 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1061 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1060 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Orr Amendment Offered |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Orr motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1059 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Bedford Amendment Offered |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2014-02-26 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 452 |
2014-02-26 | House | Clouse motion to Table adopted Roll Call 451 |
2014-02-26 | House | Knight Amendment Offered |
2014-02-26 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-06 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-30 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |