AL HB367 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-25 - Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Governmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-25 - Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Governmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Gun shows, business license tax levied on organizer not participants under certain conditions, Sec. 40-12-143 am'd.
Title
Gun shows, business license tax levied on organizer not participants under certain conditions, Sec. 40-12-143 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-25 | Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Governmental Affairs | |
2011-05-25 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-24 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs | |
2011-05-05 | Engrossed | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 699 | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 698 | |
2011-05-05 | Commerce and Small Business Amendment Offered | |
2011-05-05 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-21 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2011-03-29 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business |