AL HB366 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 8 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Forwarded to Governor at 12:03 p.m. on May 8, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Muscle Shoals, city bd. of ed., membs. election from city at large., qualifications, terms, comp., filling vacancies, referendum

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Muscle Shoals, city bd. of ed., membs. election from city at large., qualifications, terms, comp., filling vacancies, referendum

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 89 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseForwarded to Governor at 12:03 p.m. on May 8, 2020.
2020-05-08SenateSignature Requested
2020-05-08HouseClerk of the House Certification
2020-05-08HouseEnrolled
2020-05-08HousePassed Second House
2020-05-08SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 624
2020-05-08SenateThird Reading Passed
2020-03-10SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
2020-05-07SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2020-03-10HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 239
2020-03-10HouseThird Reading Passed
2020-03-05HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2020-03-03HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback