AL HB366 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Forwarded to Governor on May 3, 2017 at 5:49 p.m. on May 3, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Forwarded to Governor on May 3, 2017 at 5:49 p.m. on May 3, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Athens, alcoholic beverages, city council authorized to permit Sunday sales
Title
Athens, alcoholic beverages, city council authorized to permit Sunday sales
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 67 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2017-03-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 67 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | House | Forwarded to Governor on May 3, 2017 at 5:49 p.m. on May 3, 2017. |
2017-05-03 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-310. |
2017-05-03 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-05-03 | House | Enrolled |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-05-03 | House | Passed Second House |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 862 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2017-03-14 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 246 |
2017-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-03-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Limestone County Legislation |