AL HB366 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Finance and Taxation Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Finance and Taxation Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Law enforcement officers, firefighters, first responders, corrections officers, exposure to contagious, infectious, or communicable disease in the line of duty, blood and saliva testing of offender authorized, testing procedures, use of test results specified, notification of offender of positive results and availability of counseling and health care
Title
Law enforcement officers, firefighters, first responders, corrections officers, exposure to contagious, infectious, or communicable disease in the line of duty, blood and saliva testing of offender authorized, testing procedures, use of test results specified, notification of offender of positive results and availability of counseling and health care
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Baker [R] | Rep. Paul DeMarco [R] | Rep. Dickie Drake [R] | Rep. Allen Farley [R] |
Rep. Lynn Greer [R] | Rep. Mac McCutcheon [R] | Rep. Arthur Payne [R] | Rep. Allen Treadaway [R] |
Sen. April Weaver [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Finance and Taxation Education | |
2012-05-09 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-05-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education | |
2012-05-01 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1112 | |
2012-05-01 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-08 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-21 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |